NY A07598 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the failure to provide notice of a default judgment.
Title
Relates to the failure to provide notice of a default judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.280 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.559 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |