NY A07591 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - print number 7591b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the mental health educational opportunity program and the mental health higher educational opportunity program to provide additional educational opportunities for students at certain universities and colleges in the state to enroll in academic programs that lead to a degree or degrees required for licensure in any of the mental health professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the mental health educational opportunity program and the mental health higher educational opportunity program to provide additional educational opportunities for students at certain universities and colleges in the state to enroll in academic programs that lead to a degree or degrees required for licensure in any of the mental health professions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25Assemblyprint number 7591b
2024-01-25Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to higher education
2023-12-22Assemblyprint number 7591a
2023-12-22Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2023-05-25Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S07044 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 7044A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback