NY A07591 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to the interagency task force on human trafficking.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to the interagency task force on human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.228 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.180 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7591 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to social services |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1200 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5858 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.180 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.180 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S05858 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.228