NY A07591 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to review of standards, guidelines and criteria for education, development or learning in programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to review of standards, guidelines and criteria for education, development or learning in programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.379
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.125
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5650D
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.411
2012-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.411
2012-06-19Assemblyreported
2012-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-15Assemblyprint number 7591c
2012-06-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2012-05-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-05-16Assemblyprint number 7591b
2012-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2012-01-24Assemblyprint number 7591a
2012-01-24Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to education
2011-05-10Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S05650 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7591C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07591&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07591&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07591
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07591&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07591A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07591&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07591B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07591&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07591C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07591&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A7591#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback