NY A07590 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6553c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6553c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Yorktown, county of Westchester, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parkland.
Title
Authorizes the town of Yorktown, county of Westchester, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parkland.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6553c |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.772 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | print number 7590a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06553 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.372