NY A07581 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-11)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes standards for caseloads for child protective services workers; requires the state to pay for one hundred percent of the costs associated with compliance of such caseload standard; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes standards for caseloads for child protective services workers; requires the state to pay for one hundred percent of the costs associated with compliance of such caseload standard; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-02-19Assemblyprint number 7581a
2020-02-19Assemblyamend and recommit to children and families
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to children and families
2019-05-09Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S05809 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5809A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback