NY A07579 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - approval memo.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - approval memo.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an injured worker or person entitled to a death benefit to be provided with the option to have the compensation payment made through direct deposit, and requires such person be given notice of such option and the forms necessary to enroll.
Title
Requires an injured worker or person entitled to a death benefit to be provided with the option to have the compensation payment made through direct deposit, and requires such person be given notice of such option and the forms necessary to enroll.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | approval memo.11 |
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.253 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.813 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7210 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.237 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.237 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07210 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - approval memo.11