NY A07574 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to the management of migratory game birds.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to the management of migratory game birds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Assembly | signed chap.208 |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1365 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7038 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.148 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.148 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07038 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7574