NY A07574 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to standing of certain relatives in custody and guardianship proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to standing of certain relatives in custody and guardianship proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06Assemblyheld for consideration in judiciary
2018-03-07Assemblyprint number 7574a
2018-03-07Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2017-05-02Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S01614 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback