NY A07570 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - substituted by s8650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - substituted by s8650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that low-income subsidy data transmitted from the social security administration to local departments of social services in accordance with section 1144(c)(3) of the federal social security act shall be treated as an application for the medicare savings program, without requiring submission of another application.
Title
Provides that low-income subsidy data transmitted from the social security administration to local departments of social services in accordance with section 1144(c)(3) of the federal social security act shall be treated as an application for the medicare savings program, without requiring submission of another application.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s8650 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.249 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08650 (Same As) 2024-12-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.39