NY A07564 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - signed chap.553
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - signed chap.553
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the elimination of the use of certain single use plastic items at state university of New York and city university of New York campuses.
Title
Encourages the elimination of the use of certain single use plastic items at state university of New York and city university of New York campuses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | Assembly | signed chap.553 |
2021-10-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1665 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6815 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.262 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.262 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06815 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7564