NY A07560 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s6287c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s6287c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Elizabeth's law"; requires child care providers to be provided with informational materials on the impacts and dangers of congenital cytomegalovirus infection and the treatments and methods of prevention of cytomegalovirus infection; requires distribution of materials relating to cytomegalovirus by certain physicians.
Title
Establishes "Elizabeth's law"; requires child care providers to be provided with informational materials on the impacts and dangers of congenital cytomegalovirus infection and the treatments and methods of prevention of cytomegalovirus infection; requires distribution of materials relating to cytomegalovirus by certain physicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s6287c |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.406 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 7560b |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | print number 7560a |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to children and families |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S06287 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - SIGNED CHAP.653