NY A07555 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exempting certain basic necessities from sales and use taxes.
Title
Relates to exempting certain basic necessities from sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.99 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7838 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-05-16 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7555a |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-11 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.3 |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.3 |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06726 (Same As) 2016-04-11 - referred to ways and means
S07838 (Same As) 2016-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7555A
S07838 (Same As) 2016-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7555A