NY A07542 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - substituted by s7385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts the city of New York, the city school district of the city of New York, the New York city industrial development agency, the New York city health and hospitals corporation, or the New York city housing authority in connection with construction contracts that have an estimated cost of no less than five million dollars or is subject to an owner-controlled insurance program for projects from requirements regarding application to a particular insurance company, agent or broker.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts the city of New York, the city school district of the city of New York, the New York city industrial development agency, the New York city health and hospitals corporation, or the New York city housing authority in connection with construction contracts that have an estimated cost of no less than five million dollars or is subject to an owner-controlled insurance program for projects from requirements regarding application to a particular insurance company, agent or broker.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s7385
2023-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.664
2023-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.664
2023-06-07Assemblyreported
2023-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-06-05Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2023-05-25Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S07385 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.602

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback