NY A07541 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the penalty for the fraudulent sale of poppies, forget-me-nots, daisies, flags and other articles sold for patriotic purposes.
Title
Increases the penalty for the fraudulent sale of poppies, forget-me-nots, daisies, flags and other articles sold for patriotic purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | referred to economic development |