NY A07540 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits on-premises retail licensees to purchase wine and liquor from off-premises retail licensees and off-premises retail licensees to purchase wine and liquor from on-premises retail licensees.
Title
Permits on-premises retail licensees to purchase wine and liquor from off-premises retail licensees and off-premises retail licensees to purchase wine and liquor from on-premises retail licensees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S02853 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - referred to economic development