NY A07540 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to regulatory penalties for small businesses; provides that upon an initial violation of a state agency's rules or regulations, a small business shall be afforded a cure period or other opportunity for ameliorative action, which if successful shall prevent the imposition of a fine or fines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to regulatory penalties for small businesses; provides that upon an initial violation of a state agency's rules or regulations, a small business shall be afforded a cure period or other opportunity for ameliorative action, which if successful shall prevent the imposition of a fine or fines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1349
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5815C
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.396
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.396
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 7540b
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-06-03Assemblyprint number 7540a
2019-06-03Assemblyamend and recommit to small business
2019-05-09Assemblyreferred to small business

Same As/Similar To

S05815 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7540B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07540&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07540&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07540
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07540&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07540A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07540&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07540B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07540&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07540&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07540&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7540#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07540&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback