NY A07538 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.525
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.525
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including bus drivers and monitors as school personnel for policies and procedures concerning school safety plans on school buses.
Title
Relates to including bus drivers and monitors as school personnel for policies and procedures concerning school safety plans on school buses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.525 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.508 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a7538a |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1054 |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5705 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.508 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.508 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | print number 7538a |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05705 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.525