NY A07535 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to convey land to Debar Pond Institute, Inc. in order to facilitate the preservation of historic buildings.
Title
Amends the constitution to convey land to Debar Pond Institute, Inc. in order to facilitate the preservation of historic buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.770 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.770 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | print number 7535d |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-30 | Assembly | amended by restoring to previous print 7535a |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | print number 7535c |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | print number 7535b |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-12-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-12-08 | Assembly | print number 7535a |
2021-12-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to judiciary |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07868 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - PRINT NUMBER 7868C