NY A07518 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the elimination of duplicate electronic filings.
Title
Relates to the elimination of duplicate electronic filings.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] |
Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.793 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-04-28 | Assembly | referred to election law |