NY A07517 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disclosure requirements for nursing homes as well as the requirements for incorporation of nursing homes and residential health care facilities.
Title
Relates to disclosure requirements for nursing homes as well as the requirements for incorporation of nursing homes and residential health care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s6767 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.481 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06767 (Same As) 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.141