NY A07514 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the redaction of certain physician's names on birth certificates when such physician's license to practice medicine has been surrendered or revoked by the office of professional medical conduct.
Title
Permits the redaction of certain physician's names on birth certificates when such physician's license to practice medicine has been surrendered or revoked by the office of professional medical conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.394 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06247 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH