NY A07504 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s6196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s6196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the New York state insurance fund to enter into agreements with private insurance providers licensed to issue policies to state insurance fund policyholders covering those policyholders' obligations to secure the payment of workers' compensation benefits under the laws of states other than New York.
Title
Allows the New York state insurance fund to enter into agreements with private insurance providers licensed to issue policies to state insurance fund policyholders covering those policyholders' obligations to secure the payment of workers' compensation benefits under the laws of states other than New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s6196 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.255 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.255 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06196 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.363