NY A07500 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.447
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.447
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the notification of the next of kin of the death of an inmate.
Title
Provides for the notification of the next of kin of the death of an inmate.
Sponsors
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] |
Asm. Nily Rozic [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.447 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.941 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5427A |
2016-05-16 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2016-05-16 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7500a |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-09 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2016-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.289 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.454 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S05427 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7500A