NY A07499 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - SIGNED CHAP.40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - SIGNED CHAP.40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Schenevus central school district to apply to the commissioner of education to receive an apportionment to be used for services and expenses of such school district and to support its educational programs and any liability in carrying out the functions and responsibilities of such district.
Title
Authorizes the Schenevus central school district to apply to the commissioner of education to receive an apportionment to be used for services and expenses of such school district and to support its educational programs and any liability in carrying out the functions and responsibilities of such district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.40 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.553 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | substituted for a7499 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.611 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s4957 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.553 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04957 (Same As) 2019-06-24 - SIGNED CHAP.40