NY A07481 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-30 - print number 7481a
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-30 - print number 7481a
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to accurate reporting of crime statistics in New York city; requires data be separated where a precinct includes one or more correctional facility, detention facility, transportation facility or other location that is within the boundaries of the precinct but to which officers of the precinct are not assigned the duty to patrol and respond to incidents.
Title
Relates to accurate reporting of crime statistics in New York city; requires data be separated where a precinct includes one or more correctional facility, detention facility, transportation facility or other location that is within the boundaries of the precinct but to which officers of the precinct are not assigned the duty to patrol and respond to incidents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Assembly | print number 7481a |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06531 (Same As) 2014-02-03 - REFERRED TO CITIES