NY A07480 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - signed chap.289
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - signed chap.289
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Ulster to regulate the registration and licensing of taxicabs, limousines, and livery vehicles.
Title
Authorizes the county of Ulster to regulate the registration and licensing of taxicabs, limousines, and livery vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | Senate | signed chap.289 |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.397 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5301A |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.280 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.280 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | print number 7480a |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.280 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.280 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05301 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7480A