NY A07475 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.
Title
Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.141 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1390 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5545 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.363 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05545 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - tabled