NY A07466 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Grants municipalities the authority to provide real property tax exemptions for certain cold war veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants municipalities the authority to provide real property tax exemptions for certain cold war veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-16SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2022-02-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2022-02-16Assemblypassed assembly
2022-01-05Assemblyordered to third reading cal.242
2022-01-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-01-05SenateDIED IN SENATE
2021-06-02SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-06-02Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-06-02Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-01Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.245
2021-06-01Assemblyrules report cal.245
2021-06-01Assemblyreported
2021-05-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-19Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-05-10Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7466
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07466&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07466
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07466&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07466&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07466&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07466&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback