NY A07466 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - signed chap.31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - signed chap.31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to permissible fees in connection with open end loans.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to permissible fees in connection with open end loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | signed chap.31 |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5408 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.452 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S05408 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7466