NY A07465 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the collection of hospital sepsis data.
Title
Relates to the collection of hospital sepsis data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4874 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | star removed |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | starred on calendar |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.451 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04874 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.315