NY A07462 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including certain employees or volunteers of not-for-profit youth organizations whose primary purpose is to interact with youth through activities, events or gatherings as mandated reporters.
Title
Relates to including certain employees or volunteers of not-for-profit youth organizations whose primary purpose is to interact with youth through activities, events or gatherings as mandated reporters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | print number 7462b |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | print number 7462a |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S06635 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 6635B