NY A07461 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - print number 7461a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - print number 7461a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits disclosure of arrest and prosecution records of applicants for employment by police departments and other law enforcement agencies.
Title
Permits disclosure of arrest and prosecution records of applicants for employment by police departments and other law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Assembly | print number 7461a |
2018-02-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00420 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 420A