NY A07458 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - print number 7458a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - print number 7458a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the democracy preservation act; prohibits contributions by foreign-influenced business entities; requires certification.
Title
Enacts the democracy preservation act; prohibits contributions by foreign-influenced business entities; requires certification.
Sponsors
Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] |
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Assembly | print number 7458a |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01126 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - referred to election law