NY A07453 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-16 - print number 7453a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-16 - print number 7453a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to second felony drug offenders.
Title
Relates to second felony drug offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | Assembly | print number 7453a |
2022-09-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06638 (Same As) 2022-09-09 - PRINT NUMBER 6638A