NY A07449 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - print number 7449a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an age 55/25 temporary retirement incentive for certain public employees who are members of the teachers' retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an age 55/25 temporary retirement incentive for certain public employees who are members of the teachers' retirement system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28Assemblyprint number 7449a
2020-05-28Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental employees
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2019-05-03Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S08602 (Same As) 2020-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback