NY A07449 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the liquor authority to issue farm brewery licenses for the manufacture and sale of beer on farms.
Title
Authorizes the liquor authority to issue farm brewery licenses for the manufacture and sale of beer on farms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | print number 7449a |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05078 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES