NY A07447 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - print number 7447a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires city school districts in cities having a population of one million or more to develop class size reduction plans beginning in September 2022 to reduce the average classroom size citywide, by district, and by school in such districts by the 2027-2028 school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires city school districts in cities having a population of one million or more to develop class size reduction plans beginning in September 2022 to reduce the average classroom size citywide, by district, and by school in such districts by the 2027-2028 school year.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-07Assemblyprint number 7447a
2022-02-07Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to education
2021-05-10Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S06296 (Same As) 2022-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6296A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback