NY A07443 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-26 - signed chap.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-26 - signed chap.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces certain instances of the term "mentally retarded" with the term "individuals with developmental disabilities".
Title
Replaces certain instances of the term "mentally retarded" with the term "individuals with developmental disabilities".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-26 | Assembly | signed chap.477 |
2022-07-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.837 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6195B |
2022-05-10 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO DISABILITIES |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7443c |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2022-05-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2022-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 7443b |
2022-02-02 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 7443 |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.310 |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | print number 7443a |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to social services |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S06195 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7443C