NY A07439 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the duties of the district attorney in cases in which the final disposition includes convictions of certain felonies.
Title
Relates to the duties of the district attorney in cases in which the final disposition includes convictions of certain felonies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.193 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1966 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6406 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.305 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06406 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7439