NY A07436 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - substituted by s5309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates court attendants in the town of Highlands as peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates court attendants in the town of Highlands as peace officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-17Assemblysubstituted by s5309
2011-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.409
2011-06-17Assemblyreported
2011-06-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-05-04Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S05309 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.47

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback