NY A07434 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows deputy sheriffs Matthew Ashton, Bradley Hamilton, and Joshua Whitney, to join the optional twenty-five year retirement plan, county of Washington.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows deputy sheriffs Matthew Ashton, Bradley Hamilton, and Joshua Whitney, to join the optional twenty-five year retirement plan, county of Washington.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s5611
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.651
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-03Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S05611 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback