NY A07431 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-7)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5294a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to bicycles with electronic assist and electric scooters; defines terms; provides that every person riding an electric scooter upon a roadway shall be granted all of the rights and shall be subject to all of the duties applicable to the driver of a vehicle; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to bicycles with electronic assist and electric scooters; defines terms; provides that every person riding an electric scooter upon a roadway shall be granted all of the rights and shall be subject to all of the duties applicable to the driver of a vehicle; makes related provisions.

Sponsors

Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]
Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]
Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]
Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Melissa Miller [R]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Mark Johns [R]Asm. Michael Reilly [R]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s5294a
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.650
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-16Assemblyprint number 7431b
2019-06-16Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 7431a
2019-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2019-05-03Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S05294 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07431&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07431&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07431
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07431&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07431A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07431&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07431B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07431&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07431&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07431&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback