NY A07426 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the son of Barry M. Dennis, Gregory Dennis, to be designated the beneficiary of his retirement benefits by Bruce M. Dennis acting in his capacity as power of attorney.
Title
Relates to authorizing the son of Barry M. Dennis, Gregory Dennis, to be designated the beneficiary of his retirement benefits by Bruce M. Dennis acting in his capacity as power of attorney.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Ra [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | print number 7426a |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03474 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS