NY A07425 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-09 - signed chap.557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-09 - signed chap.557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in the case of recovery of an award from the September 11th victim compensation fund consisting solely of non-economic losses, a personal representative may file a consent to the adequacy of the award by all interested parties in lieu of a compromise proceeding.
Title
Provides that in the case of recovery of an award from the September 11th victim compensation fund consisting solely of non-economic losses, a personal representative may file a consent to the adequacy of the award by all interested parties in lieu of a compromise proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-09 | Assembly | signed chap.557 |
2022-09-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1180 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6810 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.195 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.195 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06810 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7425