NY A07422 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the peer-to-peer car sharing program act, which provides guidelines for establishing peer-to-peer car sharing programs and outlines how they shall be insured, which cars shall be used, how drivers shall work under such programs, and how liability should be determined under such programs in the case of an accident or damaged property.
Title
Enacts the peer-to-peer car sharing program act, which provides guidelines for establishing peer-to-peer car sharing programs and outlines how they shall be insured, which cars shall be used, how drivers shall work under such programs, and how liability should be determined under such programs in the case of an accident or damaged property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | print number 7422b |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | print number 7422a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S05995 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
S06581 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
S06581 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE