NY A07419 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5066a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5066a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to operating costs for substance abuse providers receiving federal aid.
Title
Relates to operating costs for substance abuse providers receiving federal aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s5066a |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.607 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | print number 7419a |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S05066 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - SIGNED CHAP.788