NY A07418 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6614
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6614
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of provisions relating to liquidator's permits and temporary retail permits.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of provisions relating to liquidator's permits and temporary retail permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6614 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.376 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.376 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06614 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.375