NY A07417 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - approval memo.15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - approval memo.15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that maximum dimension and weight limitations shall not apply to vehicles proceeding to and from a certain portion of the New York state thruway provided that such vehicles are within compliance of the dimension and weight limitations applicable to the thruway.
Title
Provides that maximum dimension and weight limitations shall not apply to vehicles proceeding to and from a certain portion of the New York state thruway provided that such vehicles are within compliance of the dimension and weight limitations applicable to the thruway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Assembly | approval memo.15 |
2021-08-02 | Assembly | signed chap.393 |
2021-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1245 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6332A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.243 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.243 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 7417a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06332 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7417A