NY A07410 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-7)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - print number 7410a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - print number 7410a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the designation of comprehensive stroke centers, primary stroke centers and acute stroke ready hospitals; relates to communication between centers; relates to emergency services providers; relates to assessment and transportation of stroke patients to a comprehensive stroke center, primary stroke center or acute stroke ready hospital; relates to continuous improvement of the quality of care for individuals with strokes; relates to coverage for telemedicine services; relates to the use and designation in advertising.
Title
Relates to the designation of comprehensive stroke centers, primary stroke centers and acute stroke ready hospitals; relates to communication between centers; relates to emergency services providers; relates to assessment and transportation of stroke patients to a comprehensive stroke center, primary stroke center or acute stroke ready hospital; relates to continuous improvement of the quality of care for individuals with strokes; relates to coverage for telemedicine services; relates to the use and designation in advertising.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Assembly | print number 7410a |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | reference changed to health |
2015-05-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05771 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - referred to health